Personal Details
Date of birth/Age: | May 27, 1980 (43) |
---|---|
Place of Birth: | Mosbach |
Citizenship: | Germany |
Coaching Licence: | UEFA A Licence |
Website: | www.goalkeeping-development.com |
Stats
No information available.
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | Matches | PPM | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bayern Munich Goalkeeping Coach | 22/23 (Feb 8, 2023) | expected Jun 30, 2026 | - | 0.00 | ||
Turkey Goalkeeping Coach | 21/22 (Oct 2, 2021) | 22/23 (Feb 7, 2023) | - | 0.00 | ||
TSG Hoffenheim Goalkeeping Coach | 14/15 (Jan 1, 2015) | 22/23 (Feb 7, 2023) | - | 0.00 | ||
Hoffenheim II Goalkeeping Coach | 13/14 (Jul 1, 2013) | 14/15 (Dec 31, 2014) | - | 0.00 | ||
BFV Chief instructor | 09/10 (Jul 1, 2009) | 17/18 (Jun 30, 2018) | - | 0.00 | ||
Hoffenheim U19 Goalkeeping Coach | 08/09 (Jul 1, 2008) | 12/13 (Jun 30, 2013) | - | 0.00 | ||
TSG Hoffenheim Goalkeeping Co-ordinator | 08/09 (Jul 1, 2008) | 22/23 (Feb 7, 2023) | - | 0.00 |
Transfer history as a player
This page displays all transfers for the selected player. Alongside the date of the transfer, the clubs involved and the transfer fee, it also displays the market value of the player at the time of the transfer.
ncG1vNJzZmivp6x7tb7Ap6qfnaKirrO302eaqKVforaktMCeo2aqlZi1r7HRaKerp5aeuXDA0Zqgp52iZH96gpNv